+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/11/2017 11:14:34 AM)