+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 709, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Bailey, Hicks, Weidner.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor