+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In conference committee upon adjournment.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators George, Prozanski, Shields appointed Senate conferees.
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Holvey, Chair; Lively, Thatcher appointed House conferees.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- House refused to concur in Senate amendments.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Knopp, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay.
- Third reading. Carried by George. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Baertschiger.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Barton.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment #2630
Adopted
Amendment #2684
Not Adopted
Amendment #2615
Not Adopted
Amendment #2434
Not Adopted
Amendment #1012
Adopted
Amendment #1326
Adopted
Amendment #717
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Consumer Protection And Government Efficiency
Type:
Primary Sponsor