+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -3
Proposed (5/21/2021 3:13 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (5/25/2021 1:45 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/22/2021 11:53 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/22/2021 11:53 AM)