+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to withdraw from Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Barnhart, Barton, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Absent, 1--Barker.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6809
5/20/2015 12:02:17 PM
Amendment #6773
5/20/2015 12:02:17 PM