+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/29/2019 1:18 PM)