+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lininger, Sollman.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (5/22/2017 10:59:35 AM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (5/19/2017 10:03:58 AM)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (5/19/2017 10:03:04 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/12/2017 1:02:26 PM)
Amendment -1
Not Adopted (4/11/2013 1:20:34 PM)
Amendment -7
Adopted (4/17/2013 3:39:03 PM)