+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to General Government.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/3/2021 4:41 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/10/2021 11:52 AM)