+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 500, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McLane.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (6/5/2017 3:30:52 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (5/2/2017 11:11:39 AM)
Amendment -4
Combined (5/4/2017 10:49:03 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/18/2013 11:04:32 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/2/2017 11:11:39 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor