+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 252, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thatcher.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor, Parrish. Passed.Ayes, 47; Excused, 4--Gorsek, Greenlick, Kennemer, Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 9--Bentz, Boone, Helm, Holvey, Johnson, McKeown, Reardon, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #6127
4/20/2015 8:36:53 AM
Amendment #6126
4/20/2015 8:36:53 AM
Amendment #5405
4/12/2015 9:49:05 PM
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor