+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 25--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 2--Boone, McKeown.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/28/2017 3:31:25 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (5/10/2017 3:41:55 PM)