+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #4253
3/5/2015 3:26:50 PM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor