+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 318, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Ferrioli.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gilliam, Gorsek, Hanna, Jenson, Speaker Kotek.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 29, 2013 Calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1893
Adopted
Amendment #1408
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor