+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 14, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 743, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Kruse; excused, 1--Devlin.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor