+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/3/2017 8:05:14 PM)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor