+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 659, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On August 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Nearman.
On July 4, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/30/2017 6:44:59 PM)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor