+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/20/2017 1:00:25 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor