+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass as amended and be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Revenue, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/21/2017 3:15:21 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor