+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 110, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Beyer, Johnson, Kruse, Whitsett.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Esquivel.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #686
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor