+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/13/2017 4:49:47 PM)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor