+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 207, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 4--Dembrow, Fagan, Matthews, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Gelser, Hanna, Read.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #286
Adopted
Amendment #196
Not Adopted
Amendment #208
Not Adopted
Amendment #218
Not Adopted
Amendment #216
Not Adopted
Amendment #217
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor