+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
- Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Nosse served notice of possible reconsideration.
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilde, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (9)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (6/9/2019 8:08 PM)
Amendment -A10
Adopted (6/13/2019 7:43 PM)
Amendment -A8
Proposed (5/29/2019 4:52 PM)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (5/29/2019 12:13 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (4/8/2019 1:53 PM)
Amendment -6`
Proposed (4/8/2019 1:53 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (4/8/2019 11:15 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/8/2019 12:04 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/3/2019 11:54 AM)