+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 205, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor