+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor