+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 278, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Starr.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.