+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/11/2019 3:49 PM)