+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 407, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 17--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2019 Calendar.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (4/25/2019 2:15 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/25/2019 1:43 PM)