+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 652, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Burdick, Devlin, Whitsett.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 45; Excused for Business of the House, 15--Barker, Buckley, Frederick, Freeman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Komp, McLane, Nathanson, Read, Richardson, Smith, Tomei, Williamson.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #347
Adopted