+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 137, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 24, 2017.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Gorsek, Stark.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2017 Calendar.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2017 Calendar.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor