+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 26--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Grayber, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Sollman, Valderrama, Williams; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
- Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 46; Nays, 12--Fahey, Grayber, Hudson, McLain, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Sollman, Williams; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Stark served notice of possible reconsideration.
- Third reading. Carried by Post. Failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 28--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Grayber, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Sollman, Stark, Valderrama, Williams; Excused, 3--Leif, Nearman, Smith G.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.