+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 419, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 16, 2015.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Greenlick, Nearman; Excused, 1--Vega Pederson.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 18, 2015 Calendar.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor