+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 54, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2019 Calendar.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/19/2019 12:26 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/19/2019 12:26 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/20/2019 8:12 PM)