+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 202, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Close, George, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hicks. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 5--Freeman, Hanna, Krieger, Olson, Weidner.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.