+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/4/2019 8:50 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/4/2019 8:50 AM)