+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 119, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 14, 2019.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/7/2019 7:20 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/21/2019 8:33 AM)