+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Dembrow, Garrett, Gelser, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Nathanson, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson; Excused, 1--Lively.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1743
Adopted