+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 129, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hoyle.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Johnson, Kruse.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 52; Absent, 1--Garrett; Excused, 5--Barton, Clem, Jenson, McKeown, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Read, Richardson.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #2111
Adopted
Amendment #2087
Not Adopted
Amendment #2110
Adopted
Amendment #195
Adopted
Amendment #140
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor