+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 56, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Barreto, Bentz, McLane, Rayfield, Smith DB, Vial; Excused, 2--Boone, Reardon; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2017 Calendar.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.