+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Alonso Leon, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Helm, Holvey, Kropf, Marsh, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Valderrama, Witt; Excused, 3--Clem, Levy, Post.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Water.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.