+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 240, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 28, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--George, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Starr.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 46; Nays, 12--Bentz, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Olson, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whitsett; Excused, 2--McKeown, Weidner.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor