+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 630, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 1--Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 1--Boone.
- Second reading.
On July 4, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -6
Adopted (6/30/2017 1:50:18 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (6/13/2017 12:27:31 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (6/13/2017 12:27:31 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/12/2017 2:48:09 PM)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor