+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 388, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Fahey, Greenlick, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, Marsh, Reardon, Sanchez, Smith Warner; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Fahey, Greenlick, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Marsh, Reardon, Sanchez, Smith Warner; Excused, 1--Heard.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/22/2017 11:15:45 AM)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor