+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/10/2017 10:56:16 AM)