+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/6/2017 8:28:14 AM)