+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 197, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 4--Helm, Holvey, Nathanson, Rayfield; Absent, 1--Drazan; Excused, 5--Barreto, Keny-Guyer, Noble, Sprenger, Stark.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Land Use.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/29/2019 1:17 PM)