+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 307, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Land Use.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/8/2019 9:06 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/8/2019 9:07 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/5/2019 11:31 AM)