+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Credits by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Tax Credits.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
3/26/2015 11:27:24 AM
Amendment #3910
2/12/2015 7:37:44 AM
Amendment #4838
3/26/2015 11:27:24 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor