+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 125, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #469
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor