+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 109, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 13, 2019.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/15/2019 2:57 PM)