+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor